FAMILY IN TRUST

Charity number: 293865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 22 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 05 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 05 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 12 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 12 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 October 2017 On time Download