ST. MARTIN'S SCHOOL (EPSOM) PARENT TEACHER & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold various events and activities which raise money for St. Martins Infant and Junior Schools, Epsom. These include a Christmas Fair, firework night, discos, film/quiz nights, raffles, second-hand uniform sales and family photo days. The money raised is used to buy extra equipment (eg.for playground/PC/laptops) and activities (eg. tennis lessons) for the children at St. Martins
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 April 1986: Standard registration
- ST MARTIN'S C.E. (AIDED) JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- ST MARTIN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- ST MARTIN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzannah Elizabeth Claire Neal | Chair | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Priscilla Simms | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Alexander Burke | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Helen Becken | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ruth Down | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.44k | £20.31k | £12.09k | £34.23k | £44.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.12k | £20.50k | £16.31k | £42.68k | £30.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 25/02/1986 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 28/02/2014 as amended on 26 May 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. 2. TO FOSTER CLOSES RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL, THE HEAD TEACHER, OTHER TEACHERS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. 3. TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF EPSOM AND EWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Martins C of E Junior School PTFA
Ashley Road
Epsom
KT18 7AD
- Phone:
- 07738118259
- Email:
- ptfaepsom@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window