Accounts and annual returns OXFORD THEATRE GUILD

Charity number: 294056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window