Financial history OXFORD THEATRE GUILD

Charity number: 294056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £50.58k £57.71k £55.94k £4.23k £28.58k
Total expenditure £58.66k £61.12k £55.81k £13.06k £38.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A