Trustees OXFORD THEATRE GUILD
Charity number: 294056

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Eyres | Chair | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Penington | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jaroslav Fowkes | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Layla Al-Katib | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Tibbles | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Billington | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Smith | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Readshaw | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC HARGREAVES | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LONG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.