THE WOMENS' CENTRE SUTTON

Charity number: 294067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kimberley Coombes Chair 01 May 2020 None on record
Vanessa Hill Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Amoke Stehfest Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Shawney Murphy Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Charlene Spring Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Aimee Stace Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Lyn Mupfurutsa Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Laura Noakes Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Karlene Reid Ms Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Rafael Carul Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record
MARCIA TURNER Trustee 26 April 2013 None on record