HACKNEY ALLOTMENTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 294128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Manage Hackney allotment provision and promote horticulture in the Borough.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020

Total income: £4,599
Total expenditure: £1,693
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PENNY MILLER Chair None on record
Ruth Margaret Gladwin Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
Hugh Naylor Trustee 06 November 2013 None on record
NANCY KORMAN Trustee 30 November 2012 None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.30k £4.03k £4.79k £4.64k £4.60k
Total expenditure £7.31k £2.37k £3.34k £2.61k £1.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 November 2020 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 10 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

Contact information

Address:
21 NORTHCHURCH TERRACE
LONDON
N1 4EB
Phone:
02072494919