Accounts and annual returns BRITISH SCOLIOSIS SOCIETY

Charity number: 294272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 August 2021 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 August 2021 282 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 February 2020 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2019 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required