BRITISH SCOLIOSIS SOCIETY

Charity number: 294272
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.81k £869 £76.92k £174.96k £32.24k
Total expenditure £3.14k £10.96k £10.96k £112.19k £26.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A