Accounts and annual returns THE SOUTH INDIAN MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 294394
Charity reporting is overdue by 950 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 220 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 220 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 585 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 585 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 950 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 950 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 March 2020 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required