JOSEPH PATRICK TRUST

Charity number: 294475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £131.28k £85.29k £76.41k £238.19k £238.06k
Total expenditure £205.87k £291.60k £341.93k £361.41k £255.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A