HESTIA HOUSING AND SUPPORT

Charity number: 294555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brendan Sarsfield Trustee 23 March 2021 None on record
MICHAEL TRUP Trustee 20 March 2018 None on record
Aisling Thompson Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record
Lauren Bowes Trustee 24 March 2020 None on record
Vic Rayner Trustee 22 November 2016
THE CARE WORKERS CHARITY Received: 3 days late
THE CARE WORKERS CHARITY Recently registered
Elizabeth Meek Trustee 06 October 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Zacharias Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
Helen Christina Marriott Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
Rebecca Pritchard Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
Anil Shenoy Trustee 24 November 2015 None on record
TERRIE ALAFAT Chair 25 September 2018
THE NATIONWIDE FOUNDATION Received: On time