GOLBORNE MOSQUE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Golborne Mosque Trust carries out a range of activities for its members and local community. The main activities are: Prayer services; the trust runs five daily prayers throughout the year, Ramadan: During the holy month of Ramadan, it provides free daily iftar (for breaking the fast). Social Gathering such as Eid celebrations, memorial and matrimonial services and spiritual counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 03 July 1986: Standard registration
- ALHUDA MOSQUE (Working name)
- THE KENSINGTON MOSQUE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AHMED YOUSSFI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Abdelkader Akhrif | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Said Daoud | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faissal Bouchab | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fatima Youssfi | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mustapha Bouyardan | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.00k | £0 | £8.67k | £9.69k | £9.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.72k | £1.46k | £7.52k | £8.79k | £3.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIGION AMONG MUSLIMS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 GOLBORNE ROAD
LONDON
W10 5PS
- Phone:
- 02089681592
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window