Trustees SOCIETY FOR ANGLO-CHINESE UNDERSTANDING
Charity number: 294651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Nash | Chair | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Holliday | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ching Man Iris Yau | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fang Wang | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barnaby Powell | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linxi Li | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jarvis | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Wong | Trustee | 16 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hicks | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
WALTER FUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZOE REED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.