Accounts and annual returns DURSTON HOUSE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 294670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 August 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 August 2020 35 days late Download Open in new window