Financial history DURSTON HOUSE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 294670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £5.50m £5.48m £5.44m £5.58m £11.08m
Total expenditure £5.13m £5.13m £5.31m £5.52m £6.51m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £178.05k £24.54k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.40k £12.25k £178.17k £27.32k £2.03k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £53.96k
Income - Charitable activities £5.42m £5.40m £5.18m £5.38m £5.95m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.07k £37.88k £37.68k £28.23k £23.71k
Income - Other £48.34k £44.41k £39.02k £40.90k £5.05m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.13m £5.13m £5.31m £5.52m £6.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £15.99k £16.35k £17.01k £17.67k £29.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0