SACRED HEART SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 294677
Charity reporting is overdue by 453 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 453 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 453 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 July 2018 16 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time Download