Financial history SACRED HEART SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 294677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £29.31k £29.35k £19.07k £10.80k £2.55k
Total expenditure £33.61k £34.47k £22.88k £8.51k £4.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A