TADS THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 294694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 April 2019 440 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required