TADS THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 294694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lea Pryer Trustee 13 June 2019 None on record
Michelle Stanton Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
Steven Pryer Chair 20 May 2014 None on record
Rachel Price Trustee 13 June 2019 None on record
Sioban Gilmartin Trustee 13 June 2019 None on record
Emily Rust Trustee 13 June 2019 None on record
Michelle Scowen Trustee 13 June 2019 None on record
Anni Bacon Trustee 13 June 2019 None on record
Emma Lidford Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
Darren Adams Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Paul Horsler Trustee 17 May 2011 None on record