Trustees THE ROWLAND TRUST

Charity number: 294714

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeff Bailey Trustee 08 May 2021
None on record
Rev Matthew Selman Trustee 24 August 2020
None on record
David Mason Trustee 06 October 2018
None on record
Sue Byrd Trustee 09 May 2017
THE FRIENDS OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
David Govier Trustee 10 February 2013
None on record
PHILIP EDWIN HUGHES Trustee
THE ARTS SOCIETY SIDMOUTH
Received: On time