Governing document CHARNEY HALL AND FIELD TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14 JUNE 1988, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29 AUGUST 2002 as amended on 06 Apr 2022 as amended on 08 Jun 2022 as amended on 08 Jun 2022 as amended on 08 Jun 2022 as amended on 08 Jun 2022 as amended on 08 Jun 2022 as amended on 20 Jul 2022 as amended on 12 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHARNEY BASSETT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CHARNEY BASSETT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.