RUSH GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association has been providing services primarily for the local community in the wider area around Rush Green, Romford and Dagenham areas for over 30 years. Our Centre Charter emphasises our key aims to welcome people, foster a climate of respect and act as a broker for the community to provide opportunity, nurture aspiration and support to local residents, their friends, and thier families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
Governance
- 08 July 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Talbot | Chair | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Dowding | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rose Wilson | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Zetter | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.73k | £97.12k | £242.77k | £248.14k | £213.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.16k | £136.88k | £256.99k | £261.59k | £219.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD JUNE 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF RUSH GREEN BY ASSOCIATING THE COUNCIL OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO FURTHER HEALTH, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TO STIMULATE PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL AND MORAL DEVELOPMENT, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND TO FOSTER A COMMUNITY SPIRIT FOR THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THESE AND ALL SUCH PURPOSES AS MAY BY LAW BE DEEMED CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RUSH GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rush Green Community Association
Rush Green Road
Romford
RM7 0LB
- Phone:
- 0808 280 8778
- Email:
- admin@rushgreencommunity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.