THE KENNINGHALL BELLS RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE FUND

Charity number: 294818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 03 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 23 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required