THE KINGSTHORPE MOORS TRUST

Charity number: 294844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required