THE ST MARY REDCLIFFE AND TEMPLE SCHOOL ENABLING FUND

Charity number: 294926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.59k £26.07k £29.08k £26.34k £26.67k
Total expenditure £26.25k £28.53k £37.78k £19.93k £18.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A