THE ST MARY REDCLIFFE AND TEMPLE SCHOOL ENABLING FUND

Charity number: 294926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Goodfellow Trustee 21 March 2019 None on record
Julie Allison Trustee 01 September 2012 None on record
Hazel Foster Trustee 21 March 2019 None on record
Helen Price Trustee 14 January 2014 None on record
Ian Morris Chair 01 September 2016 None on record
Lynda Hynam Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Helen Meadows Trustee 27 June 2019 None on record
Angela Morris Trustee 22 November 2018 None on record
ELISABETH GILPIN Trustee None on record