Trustees EPSOM AND EWELL TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 294942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDITH OSBORNE SARSSAM Chair 29 March 2011
None on record
Glenn Derrick Poy Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Simon Grosvenor Thomas Cooke Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Diane Ross Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Patricia Anne Birney Ladd Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record
Julie Ainge Harvey Trustee 14 March 2019
None on record
Heather Griffin Trustee 24 November 2016
None on record
RICHARD JOHN WHEELER Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record