UNITED KINGDOM - JAPAN 21ST CENTURY GROUP

Charity number: 295006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £76.44k £60.65k £69.45k £65.59k £51.05k
Total expenditure £68.98k £62.67k £63.86k £71.59k £60.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.10k £8.10k £8.10k £8.10k £8.10k