WOODHATCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 September 2016 On time Download