Financial history THE BURLINGTON MAGAZINE PUBLICATIONS LIMITED

Charity number: 295020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £972.38k £1.07m £995.61k £1.04m £1.02m
Total expenditure £970.07k £1.03m £1.07m £1.03m £1.04m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £22.73k £111.63k £49.71k £222.97k £241.45k
Income - Other trading activities £56.70k £90.59k £66.94k £47.66k £9.28k
Income - Charitable activities £892.72k £862.63k £876.53k £718.35k £770.89k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £230 £1.04k £2.42k £2.19k £27
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £48.40k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £943.14k £981.85k £1.04m £1.02m £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.73k
Expenditure - Governance £7.45k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £26.93k £51.00k £30.00k £13.25k £0