Trustees FIRST TORRINGTON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 295033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony James Whitear | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Davies | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Fiona Voyle | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dayna Speed | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Fry | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Whitear | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Curtis | Trustee | 02 October 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.