FENLAND ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FAT has as of 24th May 2011 been transferred to Vivacity, the Peterborough cultural and leisure Trust. The Fenland Arcaeological Trust is gradually being wound up. The existing functions will continue for the present under the control of Vivacity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 September 1986: Standard registration
- 24 January 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 January 2013: Funds transferred to 1138230 PETERBOROUGH CULTURE AND LEISURE TRUST
- FLAG FEN (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 30/06/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £433.76k | £263.79k | £224.51k | £169.53k | £74.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £310.59k | £322.40k | £309.09k | £321.30k | £467.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 01 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 23 August 2012 | 115 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 22 November 2010 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 22 November 2010 | 22 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 30 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 30 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH APRIL 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 27TH OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ARCHAEOLOGY AND TO ACQUIRE AND PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE OF THE PAST; OF THE WASH AND FENLANDS AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
THE WASH AND FENLANDS AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window