PLYMOUTH THEATRE ROYAL APPLAUSE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education of the public in relation to all aspects of the Arts of drama, mime, dance, singing and music by supporting the Theatre Royal (Plymouth), to promote the arts within the City of Plymouth and the surrounding area by encouraging public interest, involvement and appreciation, to organise lectures, demonstrations, visits, discussions and other activities to raise funds for the afor
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 25 September 1986: Standard registration
- 15 August 2016: Removed (Removed by application)
- TRAC (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.50k | £33.75k | £42.62k | £41.62k | £44.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.66k | £23.18k | £23.31k | £25.31k | £26.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 09 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 22 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 02 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 01 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 21 August 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 17 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 23 December 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF THE 18 AUGUST 1986, AS AMENDED ON 17 JUNE 1989, SEPTEMBER 1991, 16 SEPTEMBER 1995, 6 SEPTEMBER 1997, SEPTEMBER 1999, 9 SEPTEMBER 2000, SEPTEMBER 2001, 7 SEPTEMBER 2002, 9 SEPTEMBER 2006 & 6TH SEPTEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ARTS BY SUPPORTING THE THEATRE ROYAL (PLYMOUTH) LIMITED (B) TO PROMOTE THE ARTS WITHIN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY ENCOURAGING PUBLIC INTEREST, INVOLVEMENT AND APPRECIATION. (C) TO ORGANISE LECTURES, DEMONSTRATIONS, VISITS, DISCUSSIONS, AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AND TO RAISE FUNDS FOR THE AFOREMENTIONED OBJECTS (D) TO CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS, SOCIETIES, COMPANIES AND INDIVIDUALS IN FURTHERANCE OF ALL OR ANY OF THE AFOREMENTIONED OBJECTS (E) TO DO ALL OR ANY SUCH OTHER THINGS AS MAY BE NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE AFOREMENTIONED OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window