Accounts and annual returns ALDWICK PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 295133
Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2022 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 January 2021 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required