THE MUSEUM OF RICHMOND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local history museum promoting local heritage and education. Care and conservation of local history artifacts, mounting of exhibitions, educational service to local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £80,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 03 October 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Mann | Chair | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Frances Mary Lang | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Jane Everley | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mary Isaksen | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stockdale | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Chapman-Daniel | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Suzanne van Haren | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lord Lee of Trafford | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Robyn Christie | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Gillian Barling | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.18k | £133.18k | £164.88k | £130.89k | £134.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.98k | £124.31k | £141.44k | £130.20k | £127.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £80.00k | N/A | £80.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £83.00k | £102.40k | £38.39k | £80.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST AUGUST 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LOCAL HISTORY OF RICHMOND, SURREY BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Museum of Richmond
Old Town Hall
Whittaker Avenue
Richmond
TW9 1TP
- Phone:
- 02083321141
- Email:
- info@museumofrichmond.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window