Trustees LEWESTON SCHOOL TRUST
Charity number: 295175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Patrick Brunel-Cohen | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Best | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sir James Dutton | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Katharine Schofield | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Felbeck | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anthony Meehan | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Greenwood | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Mary Peacock | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lucas | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Joan Simmons de Fontanals | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dermot Robert Lyndon McKechnie | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.