Financial history FRIENDS OF SAINT MARY'S CHURCH, KINTBURY

Charity number: 295387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.74k £15.93k £22.42k £14.45k £7.56k
Total expenditure £18.09k £22.18k £6.23k £27.15k £1.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A