Trustees FRIENDS OF SAINT MARY'S CHURCH, KINTBURY

Charity number: 295387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Prout Chair 22 November 2017
None on record
Louise Janet May Trustee 14 April 2021
None on record
Valerie Wise Trustee 14 April 2021
None on record
Andrew Alexander Struthers Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
kathleen nurse Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
Alison Evans Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
June Frances Mary Brown Trustee 24 August 2015
None on record
Michael Burridge Trustee 26 February 2014
None on record
Gill Harris Trustee 05 January 2011
None on record
DAVID GEORGE PROUT Trustee
None on record