Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE CLARENCE JONES MEMORIAL PRIZE FOR SPECIAL ABILITY IN NON-ACADEMY SUBJECTS
Charity number: 526634-1
Removed charity
Governing document
LETTER DATED 17 MARCH 1965 AND MINUTES OF MEETING OF 26 APRIL 1965 AS AMENDED ON 5 JANUARY 1999 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
TWO PRIZES TO BE AWARDED ANNUALLY AT THE HEADTEACHER'S DISCREATION ONE EACH TO A BOY AND A GIRL FOR SPECIAL ABILITY IN NON-ACADEMIC SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 22 February 1966: Standard registration
- 05 September 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.