BELVEDERE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 August 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 August 2020 188 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 July 2020 545 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 July 2020 545 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 July 2017 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 November 2017 288 days late Download