BELVEDERE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £39.32k £33.94k £32.35k £39.17k £37.92k
Total expenditure £30.90k £27.32k £29.67k £46.33k £54.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A