CASTLEHAVEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295829
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REBECCA CHESHIRE Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
GREG FERRARI Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Bruce Jon Fielding Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record
Rosemary Lewin Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record
Derek Edward Jarman Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
Paul Henriot Trustee 23 November 2016 None on record
MATTHEW STEPHENSON Chair 01 May 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANSELM HAYES Recently registered
Christina NUNN Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record