Financial history THE RONALDO FALCONER CHARITY

Charity number: 295853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £8.60k £8.56k £7.05k £2.54k £4.02k
Total expenditure £2.91k £3.26k £3.20k £2.95k £1.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A