Accounts and annual returns FOUNDATION FOR CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION

Charity number: 295873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 11 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 23 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 07 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 23 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window