Trustees FOUNDATION FOR CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION

Charity number: 295873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger David Wood Chair 24 April 2014
MELTON MOWBRAY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RUTLAND AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
PEPPER'S-A SAFE PLACE
Recently registered
Diane Donaldson Trustee 01 August 2020
BIRMINGHAM BODENHAM TRUST
Overdue by 16 days
THE BIRMINGHAM INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT COMMUNITY TRUST FUND
Received: On time
SUTTON COLDFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CLARA MARTINEAU CHARITY
Overdue by 196 days
THE LORD MAYOR OF BIRMINGHAM'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Dr KEVIN MATTINSON Trustee 27 April 2017
UNIVERSITIES COUNCIL FOR THE EDUCATION OF TEACHERS (UCET)
Received: On time
Sara Collett Trustee 24 April 2014
None on record
GRAHAM COOMBS Trustee 12 November 2012
None on record
ANDREW MOSS Trustee 12 November 2012
None on record
Councillor Martin Straker Welds Trustee 16 November 2011
None on record
LES LAWRENCE Trustee 16 November 2011
None on record
KEITH MATTHEW DUDLEY Trustee
THE LORD AUSTIN TRUST
Received: On time
SUTTON COLDFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JAYNE TITCHENER Trustee
THE JOHNSON SOCIETY
Received: On time
ANTHONY COOMBS Trustee
PREMIER CHRISTIAN MEDIA TRUST
Received: On time
THE KEITH COOMBS TRUST
Received: On time