PAKISTAN WOMENS WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice, Information, Activities, Children Education, Welfare for Pakistani women in the bough of Waltham Forest
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 08 April 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nayma Moreea | Chair | 15 May 2015 |
|
|||||
SHAELAH QADEER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZUFASHAN MARYAM KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.38k | £2.06k | £2.49k | £1.47k | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.26k | £2.05k | £2.40k | £1.45k | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 February 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MARCH 1983 AND AMENDED 5TH JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PAKISTANI WOMEN LIVING IN THE BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST IN PARTICULAR IN THEIR HISTORICAL CULTURAL AND RELIGIOUS HERITAGE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AMONGST PAKISTANI WOMENGIRLS AND YOUNG CHILDREN LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (C) TO RELIEVE NED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS OF PAKISTANI ORIGIN LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE AND COUNSELLING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WALTAHM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
William Morris community centre
Greenleaf Road
Walthamstow
London
E17 6QQ
- Phone:
- 02035900727
- Email:
- pwwa@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window