THE FREDERICK MULDER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 296019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £181.01k £492.43k £193.69k £354.34k £175.50k
Total expenditure £592.05k £488.22k £650.91k £560.52k £545.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A