THE PIOUS SOCIETY OF THE DAUGHTERS OF ST PAUL

Charity number: 296042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.21m £3.08m £1.10m £1.03m £1.01m
Total expenditure £1.45m £1.61m £1.45m £1.37m £1.34m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £43.50k £66.56k £72.50k £56.50k £79.69k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.08m £1.01m £963.43k £907.06k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £483 £1.27k £4.64k £5.18k £5.26k
Income - Other £21.00k £1.93m £6.92k £2.63k £20.61k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £5.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.41m £1.46m £1.44m £1.37m £1.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £22.58k
Expenditure - Governance £8.89k £9.57k £15.12k £15.05k £13.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £26.33k £152.05k £6.29k £3.47k £0