Financial history CONSUMERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £101.15m £100.52m £101.96m £91.17m £88.87m
Total expenditure £104.94m £104.16m £99.56m £83.49m £84.62m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £100.48m £99.76m £98.61m £90.48m £88.05m
Income - Charitable activities £172.00k £142.00k £208.00k £266.00k £289.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £486.00k £620.00k £535.00k £401.00k £425.00k
Income - Other £9.00k £0 £2.61m £26.00k £108.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £24.87m £26.93m £23.56m £21.91m £23.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £80.07m £77.22m £76.00m £61.58m £61.07m
Expenditure - Governance £517.00k £596.00k £768.00k £760.00k £840.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0